YOUTH TRUST (GRANTHAM)

Charity number: 703185
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 26 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 29 September 2020 91 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 11 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 21 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 08 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required