YOUTH TRUST (GRANTHAM)

Charity number: 703185
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £1.60k £2.61k £2.34k £2.63k £1.98k
Total expenditure £1.15k £750 £1.35k £918 £1.27k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A