ARTHUR HACKER FUND

Charity number: 1125383-29
Removed charity
Governing document
LETTERS DATED 9 DEC. 1919 AND 22 FEB. 1920 AND SCHEME OF 13 APRIL 1972
Charitable objects
PROVIDE A PRIZE TO BE AWARDED YEARLY TO A STUDENT OF THE ROYAL ACADEMY OF ARTS IN LONDON FOR A PORTRAIT OF A HEAD AND SHOULDERS FROM LIFE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 31 July 1963: Standard registration
  • 19 May 1998: Removed (Funds transferred (s.74))
  • 19 May 1998: Funds transferred to 1125383-43 ROYAL ACADEMY TRUST
Other names

No other names

This charity is a linked charity of