THE CHARITY KNOWN AS THE LAMMAS LANDS

Charity number: 213092-1
Removed charity
Governing document
SCHEMES OF 13 DECEMBER 1938, 5 OCTOBER 1943, AND 24 JUNE 1969
Charitable objects
RELIEVING PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF THE ANCIENT PARISH OF BENGEO WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS. (FUNDS TRANSFERRED TO MAIN CHARITY 213092 CA 85 S.3 RESOLUTION)
Area of benefit
ANCIENT PARISH OF BENGEO
Registration history
  • 20 March 1970: Standard registration
  • 01 June 1992: Removed
Other names

No other names