Accounts and annual returns THE CHAMPNISS FOUNDATION

Charity number: 800015
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2022 30 January 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 30 January 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2021 01 February 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 01 February 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 02 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 02 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2019 31 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 31 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2018 21 February 2019 16 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 21 February 2019 16 days late Download Open in new window