Accounts and annual returns ST CRISPIN'S PARENT/TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 800021
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2022 10 May 2024 315 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 30 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 30 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 23 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 27 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required