Accounts and annual returns INTERNATIONAL INSTITUTE FOR ENVIRONMENT AND DEVELOPMENT

Charity number: 800066
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 29 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 29 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 09 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 09 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 16 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 16 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 22 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 22 December 2017 On time Download Open in new window