THE MARY SHERIDAN CENTRE

Charity number: 800160
Charity reporting is overdue by 182 days

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Relief of mentally or physically handicapped children and young persons wholly or mainly in the county of Kent.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022

Total income: £520
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Kent

Governance

Registration history:
  • 06 October 1988: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Investment
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
CAROLINE MARY ESME VAILE Trustee 31 October 2013
None on record
TIMOTHY PATRICK BOLTON Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022
Total gross income £559 £577 £552 £546 £520
Total expenditure £558 £2.45k £2.51k £2.80k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 182 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 182 days
Annual return 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 19 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 14 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 25 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
DEARNLEY
BEKESBOURNE ROAD
BRIDGE
CANTERBURY
CT4 5AE
Phone:
01227451304
Website:

No information available