Accounts and annual returns Family Holiday Charity

Charity number: 800262
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 26 July 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 26 July 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 12 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 12 August 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 17 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 17 June 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2018 29 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 29 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2017 02 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 02 May 2018 On time Download Open in new window