Trustees Family Holiday Charity

Charity number: 800262
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Philippa Anne Harris Chair 22 March 2018
TENTERDEN MINDFULNESS GROUP
Received: On time
BIDDENDEN CONSOLIDATED CHARITY
Received: On time
INGRID BUSSELL Trustee 28 April 2022
None on record
Charlotte Hills Trustee 31 January 2022
None on record
Julie Dawn Tucker Trustee 09 July 2019
None on record
Jaqueline Ann Kerslake Trustee 09 July 2019
None on record
John Leslie de Vial Trustee 09 July 2019
None on record
Mark Saxon Trustee 22 March 2018
None on record
John Montague Appleby Trustee 17 March 2016
None on record
DAVID JOHN BURLING Trustee
None on record