ST MARGARET CLITHEROW PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 800310
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 17 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 23 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 23 November 2020 146 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 11 October 2019 103 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 12 November 2019 135 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 19 September 2018 81 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

19 September 2018 81 days late Download