ST MARGARET CLITHEROW PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 800310
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £31.32k £25.05k £24.49k £14.26k £1.76k
Total expenditure £23.85k £34.24k £24.22k £11.74k £504
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A