THE FACE CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 800331
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £64.79k £56.20k £24.55k £11.09k £19.18k
Total expenditure £42.57k £64.15k £33.70k £15.22k £35.72k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A