ST LAWRENCE CHARITABLE FUND

Charity number: 800344
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £17.56k £21.42k £15.55k £17.50k £47.66k
Total expenditure £20.55k £18.52k £19.22k £21.74k £19.29k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A