ST LUKE'S CE SCHOOL PARENTS TEACHERS FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 800401
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £11.03k £9.10k £13.48k £14.65k £4.11k
Total expenditure £12.21k £9.03k £6.65k £25.20k £2.00k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A