ROCKWELL GREEN CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP TRUST

Charity number: 800411
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £35.82k £39.33k £32.40k £46.18k £46.97k
Total expenditure £37.12k £32.70k £32.94k £36.01k £42.78k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A