ASHDOWN FOREST TRUST

Charity number: 800437
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £70.44k £70.28k £70.09k £72.84k £70.45k
Total expenditure £67.97k £72.87k £73.42k £73.44k £65.58k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A