Accounts and annual returns ENGLISH DISABLED FLY FISHERS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 800452
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 09 August 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 05 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 25 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 19 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 05 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required