Financial history THE ADRIAN SWIRE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 800493
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £1.12m £1.83m £1.69m £1.42m £1.77m
Total expenditure £1.11m £1.21m £1.70m £1.33m £1.63m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £312.50k £636.73k £276.74k £773 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £312.50k £636.73k £0 £773 £0
Income - Investment £1.12m £1.19m £1.41m £1.42m £1.77m
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £250.00k £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.11m £1.21m £1.70m £1.32m £1.62m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £9.74k £18.03k
Expenditure - Governance £43.49k £48.64k £52.79k £50.32k £45.23k
Expenditure - Grants institution £1.06m £1.16m £1.65m £1.27m £1.57m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £9.74k £18.03k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0