THE FLORENCE WHITE MEMORIAL TRUST

Charity number: 800550
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 11 May 2020 09 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 11 May 2020 Not Required
Annual return 11 May 2019 16 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 11 May 2019 Not Required
Annual return 11 May 2018 24 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 11 May 2018 Not Required
Annual return 11 May 2017 16 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 11 May 2017 Not Required
Annual return 11 May 2016 27 July 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 11 May 2016 Not Required