THE FLORENCE WHITE MEMORIAL TRUST

Charity number: 800550
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
11/05/2016 11/05/2017 11/05/2018 11/05/2019 11/05/2020
Total gross income £4.19k £4.82k £3.92k £5.11k £3.77k