Financial history ASSOCIATION OF GENERAL PRACTITIONERS OF NATURAL MEDICINE

Charity number: 800556
Charity reporting is overdue by 1725 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2009 31/12/2010 31/12/2011 31/12/2012 31/12/2013
Total gross income £3.46k £1.93k £1.82k £2.16k £2.16k
Total expenditure £1.04k £1.04k £1.04k £1.04k £1.04k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A