ST FRANCIS PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENTS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 800648
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 24 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 10 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 10 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 20 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 13 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required