ST FRANCIS PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENTS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 800648
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £11.13k £15.06k £8.02k £12.13k £12.55k
Total expenditure £8.39k £14.16k £7.19k £9.27k £20.66k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A