Accounts and annual returns THE HELPSTON AND ETTON COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 800698
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 10 January 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 20 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 19 May 2021 108 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 10 February 2020 10 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 09 January 2020 343 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required