Financial history THE HELPSTON AND ETTON COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 800698
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £4.39k £5.18k £4.98k £10.96k £24.16k
Total expenditure £5.26k £4.76k £4.98k £4.16k £5.31k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £10.00k £20.91k