HARRIS CITY ACADEMY, CRYSTAL PALACE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Operation of a City Technology College - ceased with effect from1 September 2007
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2008
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Croydon
- Surrey
Governance
- 18 January 1989: Standard registration
- 11 February 2010: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 11 February 2010: Funds transferred to 1120150 HARRIS FEDERATION OF SOUTH LONDON SCHOOLS
- HARRIS CITY ACADEMY (Previous name)
- HARRIS CITY TECHNOLOGY COLLEGE (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2004 | 31/08/2005 | 31/08/2006 | 31/08/2007 | 31/08/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.08m | £5.17m | £5.50m | £5.96m | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.86m | £5.11m | £5.48m | £5.92m | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £6.19k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £5.85m | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | £34.80k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £69.57k | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £5.89m | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | £21.00k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2008 | 30 June 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2007 | 04 June 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2007 | 05 June 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2006 | 27 June 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2006 | 27 June 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2005 | 16 May 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2005 | 16 May 2006 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 9TH DECEMBER 1988 AS AMENDED BY WRITTEN RESOLUTION PASSED ON 12TH AUGUST 2004
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT EDUCATION IN THE UNITED KINGDOM, IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING BY ESTABLISHING MAINTAINING CARRYING ON AND DEVELOPING ONE OR MORE SECONDARY SCHOOLS OR COLLEGES OFFERING A BROAD CURRICULUM WITH A STRONG EMPHASIS ON SCIENCE, TECHNOLOGY, AND THEIR PRACTICAL APPLICATION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE CROYDON LB
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window