CORFE MULLEN DAY CARE CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Day centre on Mondays during term time - providing a social day out for lonely elderly of Corfe Mullen.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
9 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Dorset
Governance
- 30 January 1989: Standard registration
No other names
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Janet Christine Sparkes Mrs. | Trustee | 14 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
PAMELA HELEN PARKES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
WILHELMINA ALLAN SAINS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.44k | £2.44k | £436 | £3.78k | £11.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.77k | £3.77k | £549 | £6.24k | £7.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 19 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 10 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 20 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 04 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 26 November 2020 | 119 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19TH MAY 1988 AND AMENDED 1ST SEPTEMBER 1988
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE WELFARE OF THE AGED IN ANY MANNER WHICH IS NOW, OR HEREAFTER MAY BE DEEMED BY LAW TO BE, CHARITABLE WITHIN CORFE MULLEN AND IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING) TO: (A) PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN A DAY CENTRE FOR THE PURPOSE OF RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. (B) PROVIDE MEALS TO ELDERLY PERSONS WHO THROUGH AGE IN INFIRMITY FIND IT DIFFICULT TO PREPARE MEALS FOR THEMSELVES.
Area of benefit
CORFE MULLEN
Contact information
- Address:
-
55 Honeysuckle Lane
POOLE
Dorset
BH17 7YY
- Phone:
- 01202884923
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window