Governing document BEAUFORT COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 09/05/1988 AS AMENDED ON 30/11/1988 AS AMENDED ON 06/09/1989 AS AMENDED ON 02/10/1990 AS AMENDED ON 28/11/2008 AS AMENDED ON 28/03/2011
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE WARDS OF BOSCOMBE EAST,LITTLEDOWN, SOUTHBOURNE AND WEST SOUTHBOURNE AND SURROUNDING AREAS IN THE BOROUGH OF BOURNEMOUTH AND NEIGHBOURHOOD THEREOF WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS. B. TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE, OR TO CO-OPERATE WITH ANY LOCAL STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE ASSOCIATION AND ITS CONSTITUENT BODIES IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.