HODDELL CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 800865
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £7.50k £7.50k £9.50k £6.00k £7.50k
Total expenditure £6.76k £8.61k £8.75k £8.70k £7.03k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A