THE DAY FOUNDATION

Charity number: 800930
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 22 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 22 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2019 18 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 18 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2018 17 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 19 September 2019 142 days late Download
Annual return 30 June 2017 21 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 26 October 2017 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2016 13 August 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 17 August 2016 On time Download