Governing document THE KIDNEY FUND
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 05/01/1989 AS AMENDED ON 16/01/1997 AS AMENDED ON 19/02/2006 AS AMENDED ON 18/02/2007 AS AMENDED ON 27 APR 2016
Charitable objects
THE FUND IS ESTABLISHED; 1) TO PROVIDE RELIEF TO PERSONS SUFFERING FROM KIDNEY DISEASE OR DISABILITY BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF AMENITIES AND EQUIPMENT, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY FOR THE SW THAMES REGIONAL RENAL UNIT; 2) TO PROMOTE RESEARCH AND PUBLICATION OF USEFUL RESULTS.
Area of benefit
SOUTH WEST THAMES
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.