LONDON'S AIR AMBULANCE LIMITED

Charity number: 801013
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 02 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 02 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 09 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 09 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 03 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 03 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 19 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 26 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 07 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 07 December 2016 On time Download