Accounts and annual returns Docklands Sailing Centre Trust

Charity number: 801049
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 29 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 29 December 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 05 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 05 December 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 06 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 06 December 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 17 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 25 June 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 01 March 2018 29 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 24 October 2017 On time Download Open in new window