Financial history Docklands Sailing Centre Trust

Charity number: 801049
Charity reporting is overdue by 50 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £607.32k £705.79k £717.87k £790.20k £516.27k
Total expenditure £702.68k £642.35k £739.98k £781.09k £432.29k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £59.70k
Income - Donations and legacies £33.41k £32.34k £33.53k £69.22k £287.13k
Income - Other trading activities £350.89k £451.63k £433.01k £459.62k £22.65k
Income - Charitable activities £220.59k £221.60k £250.75k £260.25k £206.49k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £20 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £2.42k £212 £577 £1.12k £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £316.37k £299.20k £363.71k £378.49k £353.19k
Expenditure - Raising funds £21.94k £11.73k £376.28k £20.11k £79.10k
Expenditure - Governance £2.64k £3.03k £3.11k £2.70k £2.70k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £364.37k £331.42k £0 £382.49k £0