Financial history H R STEPHENS BENEFACTION FOR ALMONDSBURY PARISH CHURCH

Charity number: 801147
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £2.44k £2.54k £2.85k £1.84k £1.91k
Total expenditure £697 £0 £1.78k £302 £3.30k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A