THE FRIENDS OF ST LUKE'S CHURCH, KINGSTON UPON THAMES

Charity number: 801167
Charity reporting is overdue by 666 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 300 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 300 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 666 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 666 days
Annual return 31 March 2018 10 October 2019 252 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 22 February 2018 22 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 23 February 2017 23 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required