THE FRIENDS OF ST LUKE'S CHURCH, KINGSTON UPON THAMES

Charity number: 801167
Charity reporting is overdue by 667 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018
Total gross income £86 £20 £0 £56 £126
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £100
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A