WELLINGBOROUGH AND EAST NORTHAMPTONSHIRE WOMEN'S AID

Charity number: 801199
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1193 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1193 days
Annual return 31 March 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1558 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1558 days
Annual return 31 March 2015 29 December 2015 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 29 December 2015 On time
Annual return 31 March 2014 17 December 2014 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 19 December 2014 On time
Annual return 31 March 2013 23 December 2013 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 16 December 2013 On time