WELLINGBOROUGH AND EAST NORTHAMPTONSHIRE WOMEN'S AID

Charity number: 801199
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2011 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015
Total gross income £387.67k £354.02k £436.44k £388.89k £314.11k
Total expenditure £371.82k £374.24k £463.06k £449.73k £336.98k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £7.50k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £185.30k