Financial history THE MYALGIC ENCEPHALOPATHY ASSOCIATION LIMITED

Charity number: 801279
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £326.00k £419.33k £555.71k £1.11m £1.26m
Total expenditure £387.40k £454.49k £499.97k £493.09k £486.33k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £513.59k £1.07m £1.21m
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £23.30k £22.97k £43.98k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A £15.50k £7.51k £10.72k
Income - Other N/A N/A £3.32k £8.24k £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £192.82k £732.79k £703.72k
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £499.97k £493.09k £486.33k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £4.30k £4.33k £6.97k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £173.82k £150.34k £73.08k
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 £0