Financial history TRAFALGAR CHRISTIAN CONGREGATION

Charity number: 801281
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 11/11/2018 11/11/2019 11/11/2020 11/11/2021 11/11/2022
Total gross income £5.04k £5.27k £3.13k £3.11k £5.79k
Total expenditure £2.52k £4.38k £4.05k £2.03k £4.93k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A