WELLINGTON MUSEUM SOCIETY

Charity number: 801321
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £4.85k £4.52k £3.79k £4.24k £668
Total expenditure £3.42k £3.21k £5.03k £3.82k £2.51k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A