ST PETER AND ST PAUL WORTH PRESERVATION TRUST

Charity number: 801322
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £6.26k £6.03k £6.19k £1.70k £34
Total expenditure £5.51k £60 £3.16k £1.06k £2.33k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A