Trustees ST PETER AND ST PAUL WORTH PRESERVATION TRUST
Charity number: 801322
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CAROLYN ILLSLEY | Chair | 31 March 1998 |
|
|
||||
Nicky Spence | Trustee | 11 October 2022 |
|
|||||
Sara Welham | Trustee | 10 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jane Lambourne | Trustee | 25 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
John Simmons | Trustee | 12 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
ANNE MARIE SIMMONS | Trustee | 29 October 2013 |
|
|||||
MALCOLM BERNARDES | Trustee | 12 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
DEBORAH VAN BLOMMESTEIN | Trustee | 25 July 1998 |
|
|
||||
LT COL HOWARD HOLROYD | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.