HOO ST WERBURGH BELL RESTORATION FUND

Charity number: 801324
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 February 2021 30 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 Not Required
Annual return 29 February 2020 09 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2019 13 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2019 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2018 19 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2018 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2017 27 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2017 Not Required