THE JESUS KINGDOM TRUST

Charity number: 801326
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £24.00k £24.00k £479.84k £21.60k £14.66k
Total expenditure £15.92k £10.80k £478.79k £9.12k £195.11k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A