BEAT (FORMERLY EATING DISORDERS ASSOCIATION)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Beat exists to end the pain and suffering caused by eating disorders. We: Support people affected by anorexia, bulimia, binge eating disorder or other eating disorders through helplines, online support and information. Campaign for change to government policy and health service practice to improve the care for and understanding of eating disorders. Educate professionals and the public.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
Total income:
£4,550,512
Donations and legacies | £3.81m | |
Charitable activities | £732.33k | |
Other trading activities | £5.15k | |
Investments | £2.83k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£6,714,368
Raising funds | £1.01m | |
Charitable activities | £5.70m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £703,063 from 55 government contract(s) and £55,419 from 2 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £1.01m | |
Charitable expenditure | £5.70m |
People

163 Employee(s)
8 Trustee(s)
480 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
£70k to £80k | 3 |
£80k to £90k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- BEAT (Previous name)
- EATING DISORDERS ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRISTOPHER JOHN MARTIN | Chair | 17 March 2025 |
|
|||||
Danielle Twitchell | Trustee | 17 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Angela Hind | Trustee | 17 March 2025 |
|
|||||
Malika Bouazzaoui | Trustee | 17 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Selma Stafford | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emily Rothwell | Trustee | 22 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Smart | Trustee | 29 June 2018 |
|
|||||
VALERIE JOLLIFFE | Trustee | 28 September 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.98m | £2.58m | £3.42m | £4.99m | £4.55m | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.54m | £2.64m | £2.75m | £4.54m | £6.71m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £150.92k | £135.78k | £147.52k | £386.06k | £703.06k | |
|
Income from government grants | £3.19k | £23.68k | £201.42k | N/A | £55.42k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.78m | £2.40m | £3.22m | £4.51m | £3.81m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £4.05k | £0 | £11.16k | £0 | £5.15k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £183.09k | £170.62k | £183.97k | £475.61k | £732.33k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £12.37k | £1.23k | £84 | £214 | £2.83k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £3.61k | £0 | £4.06k | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £43.13k | £5.97k | £5.06k | £24.56k | £27.96k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.94m | £1.74m | £1.90m | £3.54m | £5.70m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £595.52k | £896.04k | £850.22k | £1.00m | £1.01m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £54.10k | £59.13k | £56.04k | £59.41k | £62.97k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £116.97k | £66.96k | £49.89k | £37.01k | £24.69k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £1.45m | £1.64m | £2.66m | £4.60m | £1.87m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£20.91k | -£16.38k | -£13.41k | -£1.43k | -£2.50k | |
|
Total liabilities | £171.88k | £376.82k | £710.76k | £2.21m | £1.83m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 22 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 17 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 09 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 01 November 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 01 November 2019 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 05/04/1989 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11/03/2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22/09/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18/10/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02/10/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07/10/2006 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 07/03/2011 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 24/03/2011 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 18 OCT 2018 as amended on 24 Mar 2020
Charitable objects
(A) THE RELIEF OF THOSE SUFFERING FROM ANOREXIA NERVOSA, BULIMIA NERVOSA, BINGE EATING DISORDER, OTHER EATING DISORDERS AND DISORDERED EATING(HEREINAFTER IN THIS CLAUSE REFERRED TO AS 'EATING DISORDERS'). (B) THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF THE FAMILIES OF THOSE CLOSELY INVOLVED WITH THE SUFFERERS OF EATING DISORDERS BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE AND INFORMATION. (C) THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN RESPECT OF THE NATURE AND TREATMENT OF EATING DISORDERS. (D) THE PROMOTION OF RESEARCH INTO THE CAUSE AND TREATMENT OF EATING DISORDERS AND THE DISSEMINATION OF THE RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Beat (Eating Disorders Association)
1 Chalk Hill House
19 Rosary Road
NORWICH
NR1 1SZ
- Phone:
- 01603753305
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window