DRAMA UK
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Drama UK (Formerly the National Council for Drama Training and Conference of Drama Schools) is a partnership of employers in the theatre, broadcast and media industry, employee representatives and training providers. It exists to act as a champion for the industry by working to optimise support for professional drama training and education, embracing change and development.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2016
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Scotland
Governance
- 24 April 1989: Standard registration
- 11 November 2017: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- NCDT (Working name)
- NATIONAL COUNCIL FOR DRAMA TRAINING (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2012 | 31/08/2013 | 31/08/2014 | 31/08/2015 | 30/11/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £236.76k | £184.58k | £220.65k | £234.46k | £201.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £158.90k | £211.38k | £251.08k | £233.38k | £205.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2016 | 28 June 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2016 | 28 June 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2015 | 23 August 2016 | 54 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2015 | 23 August 2016 | 54 days late | |
Annual return | 31 August 2014 | 07 October 2015 | 99 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2014 | 07 October 2015 | 99 days late | |
Annual return | 31 August 2013 | 30 June 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2013 | 30 June 2014 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 22/03/1989 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18/03/2004 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 18/01/2012
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE VOCATIONAL EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF YOUNG PERSONS AND STUDENTS IN ALL FORMS OF DRAMATIC ART.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window