Financial history THE NATIONAL CHILDBIRTH TRUST

Charity number: 801395
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £16.72m £15.55m £15.29m £14.35m £10.41m
Total expenditure £16.21m £15.91m £16.72m £16.47m £10.35m
Income from government contracts £411.00k £583.00k £447.00k £487.00k £561.00k
Income from government grants £100.00k £167.00k £236.00k £4.00k £617.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £2.10m £1.92m £1.69m £1.40m £1.51m
Income - Other trading activities £1.99m £1.33m £1.30m £1.14m £308.00k
Income - Charitable activities £12.39m £12.03m £12.00m £11.53m £8.48m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £116.00k £161.00k £190.00k £155.00k £77.00k
Income - Other £133.00k £116.00k £108.00k £120.00k £37.00k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £1.00k £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £13.99m £14.49m £14.96m £14.85m £9.38m
Expenditure - Raising funds £2.22m £787.00k £876.00k £1.49m £478.00k
Expenditure - Governance £53.00k £38.00k £0 £41.00k £34.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £27.00k £33.00k £0 £0 £17.00k
Expenditure - Other £0 £631.00k £891.00k £120.00k £495.00k